Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/11/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/11/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/12/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/12/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/15/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/15/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/16/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/16/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/16/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/16/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/16/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/16/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/16/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/16/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/16/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/16/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/17/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/17/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/17/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/18/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/18/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/18/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/18/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/22/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/25/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/25/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/25/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/25/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/25/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/25/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/04/2002