Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/17/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/09/2002