There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Civil War Battlefield Preservation Act of 2002

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Civil War Battlefield Preservation Act of 2002

Short Titles as Reported to House

Civil War Battlefield Preservation Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil War Battlefield Preservation Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the American Battlefield Protection Act of 1996 to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish a battlefield acquisition grant program.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-359. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/10/2002Presented to President.
11/20/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
10/01/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6874-6875)
10/01/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-710.
07/15/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/17/2002Became Public Law No: 107-359. (TXT | PDF)
12/17/2002Signed by President.
12/10/2002HousePresented to President.
11/20/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 11/19/2002 S11652-11655)
10/08/2002SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 687.
10/08/2002SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. Without written report.
10/02/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/01/2002-6:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2002-6:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6874-6875)
10/01/2002-6:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5125.
10/01/2002-6:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6874-6875)
10/01/2002-6:27pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/01/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 441.
10/01/2002HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-710.
09/12/2002HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands Discharged.
09/12/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/12/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/23/2002HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
07/23/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/15/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/15/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources07/15/2002 Referred to
09/12/2002 Markup by
10/01/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-710
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands07/23/2002 Referred to
09/12/2002 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/02/2002 Referred to
10/08/2002 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5125. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/01/2002)

Civil War Battlefield Preservation Act of 2002 - Amends the American Battlefield Protection Act of 1996 to direct the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the American Battlefield Protection Program, to establish a battlefield acquisition grant program under which the Secretary may provide grants to a State or local government (eligible entity) to pay the Federal share of the cost of acquiring interests in eligible sites for the preservation and protection of those sites.

Permits an eligible entity to acquire an interest in an eligible site using a grant in partnership with a nonprofit organization. Requires the non-Federal share of the total cost of acquiring an interest in a site to be not less than 50 percent. Subjects acquired property to the prohibition against conversion to other than public outdoor recreation uses, without the Secretary's approval.

Requires the Secretary to submit to Congress: (1) a report on activities carried out under this Act; and (2) a report that updates the Report on the Nation's Civil War Battlefields to reflect preservation activities and changes in the condition of the 384 battlefields.

Authorizes appropriations to the Secretary to: (1) provide battlefield acquisition grants for FY 2004 through 2008; and (2) carry out the update of such Report.

Extends the American Battlefield Protection Program through FY 2008.