Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/07/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/22/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/22/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/03/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/24/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/02/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/25/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/25/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/13/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/2002