Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/18/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/18/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/18/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 07/18/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/2002