Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/18/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/18/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/07/2002