Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/22/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/22/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/19/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/24/2002