There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans National Heritage Preservation Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for preservation and protection of historic buildings under the jurisdiction of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
08/09/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/05/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/25/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1361-1362)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2002Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2002Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2002Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/24/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs07/24/2002 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/09/2002 Referred to
House Resources07/24/2002 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/05/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5202.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5202. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2002)

Veterans National Heritage Preservation Act of 2002 - Makes it a mission and responsibility of the Department of Veterans Affairs to maintain its most significant historic buildings and to preserve them for future generations. Expresses the sense of Congress calling for the preservation and reuse of such buildings.

Establishes in the Department an Office of Historic Preservation, headed by a Director with specified duties relating to the preservation of the Department's historic buildings.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish the Veterans Heritage Preservation Fund for the preservation, renovation, and restoration of such buildings.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into cooperative agreements and leases, including enhanced-use leases, for restoring, rehabilitating, maintaining, interpreting, and promoting historic buildings.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a National Historic Landmark theme study at specified locations to identify sites, structures, and landscapes that best illustrate or commemorate key events at facilities managed by the National Home for Disabled Volunteer Soldiers and the United States Veterans Bureau between 1865 and 1930.