Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/25/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/11/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/23/2002