Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/14/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/14/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/13/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/13/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/27/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/19/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/19/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/19/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/19/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/19/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/19/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/20/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/21/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/21/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/28/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/28/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/05/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/10/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/01/2001