Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/28/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/03/2001