Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/19/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/20/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/21/2001