Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/23/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/23/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/25/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/01/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/01/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/01/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/01/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/01/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/01/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/01/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/02/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/02/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/02/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/02/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/02/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/03/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/07/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/07/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/07/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/07/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/07/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/08/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/09/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/16/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/17/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/21/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/21/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/21/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/21/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/24/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/28/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/31/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/31/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/31/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/08/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/12/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/13/2002