There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Preservation Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the Social Security trust funds by ensuring that the Government repays its debts to the trust funds.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/26/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/26/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/08/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/08/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/08/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/08/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/08/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/08/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/08/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/08/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/08/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/08/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/08/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/08/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/08/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/16/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/16/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/24/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/26/2002 Referred to
House Budget07/26/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5252.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2002)

Social Security Preservation Act of 2002 - Repudiates the statements of: (1) the Secretary of the Treasury, Paul O'Neill, that the social security program (title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act) is a "pyramid game" and that the social security trust funds (Federal Old-Age and Survivors Insurance Trust Fund and Federal Disability Insurance Trust Fund) have "no assets;" and (2) the statements of congressional leaders that the social security trust funds are "empty," a "total fraud," "a mere accounting device", and consist of "worthless IOUs."

Prohibits the use by the Treasury of amounts borrowed from the social security trust funds to pay for other Government expenditures in a fiscal year, unless, during the nine month period immediately preceding the year, the Congress has enacted legislation explicitly affirming that the Treasury will repay these funds.

Amends Federal law to require the President to include in each budget: (1) the total amount the Treasury has borrowed from the social security trust funds; and (2) explanations of repayment plans and the impact any legislation enacted in the preceding year will have on them.

Requires the Secretary to affirm annually that the Treasury will honor the securities in such trust funds.

Allows any individual credited with wages or self-employment income under Medicare to bring an action in an appropriate Federal district court to enjoin any act or practice: (1) by which the Secretary contests an obligation issued for purchase by either social security trust fund; or (2) which constitutes a failure to provide for redemption of the obligation in accordance with its terms or to otherwise honor the full faith and credit of the United States supporting such obligation.