Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (07/26/2002)

Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2003 - Title I: Agricultural Programs - Appropriates funds for FY 2003 for the following Department of Agriculture (Department) programs and services: (1) Office of the Secretary of Agriculture (Secretary); (2) executive operations; (3) Office of the Assistant Secretary for Administration; (4) agriculture buildings and facilities and rental payments; (5) hazardous materials management; (6) departmental administration; (7) Office of the Assistant Secretary for Congressional Relations; (8) Office of Communications; (9) Office of the Inspector General; (10) Office of the General Counsel; (11) Office of the Under Secretary for Research, Education, and Economics; (12) Economic Research Service; (13) National Agricultural Statistics Service; (14) Agricultural Research Service; (15) Cooperative State Research, Education, and Extension Service; (16) Office of the Under Secretary for Marketing and Regulatory Programs; (17) Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service; (18) Agricultural Marketing Service; (19) Grain Inspection, Packers and Stockyards Administration; (20) Office of the Under Secretary for Food Safety; (21) Food Safety and Inspection Service; (22) Office of the Under Secretary for Farm and Foreign Agricultural Services; (23) Farm Service Agency; (24) Risk Management Agency; (25) Federal Crop Insurance Corporation Fund; and (26) Commodity Credit Corporation Fund.

Title II: Conservation Programs - Appropriates funds for the following: (1) Office of the Under Secretary for Natural Resources and Environment; and (2) Natural Resources Conservation Service.

Title III: Rural Development Programs - Appropriates funds for the following: (1) Office of the Under Secretary for Rural Development; (2) Rural Housing Service; (3) Rural Business-Cooperative Service; and (4) Rural Utilities Service.

Title IV: Domestic Food Programs - Appropriates funds for the following: (1) Office of the Under Secretary for Food, Nutrition and Consumer Services; and (2) Food and Nutrition Service.

Title V: Foreign Assistance and Related Programs - Appropriates funds for the following: (1) Foreign Agricultural Service; (2) Public Law 480 program account, title I ocean freight differential grants, and title II grants; and (3) Commodity Credit Corporation export loans program account.

Title VI: Related Agencies and Food and Drug Administration- Appropriates funds for the following: (1) Food and Drug Administration (FDA); (2) Commodity Futures Trading Commission; and (3) Farm Credit Administration.

Title VII: General Provisions - Specifies certain uses and limits on or prohibitions against the use of funds appropriated by this Act.

(Sec. 713) Authorizes cooperative agreements among the marketing services of the Agricultural Marketing Service, the Grain Inspection, Packers and Stockyards Administration, the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, and the food safety activities of the Food Safety and Inspection Service.

(Sec. 716) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act for the Safe Meat and Poultry Inspection Panel.

(Sec. 721) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act for the initiative for future agriculture and food systems, with an exception for administration of grants and obligations made before November 28, 2001.

(Sec. 722) Prohibits FDA fund use to reduce the FDA District Office in Detroit, Michigan, below specified staffing levels. Stipulates that such provision shall not apply to FDA field laboratory facilities in Detroit, except that such personnel shall be assigned to Detroit-vicinity facilities.

(Sec. 724) Prohibits fund use to relocate a State Rural Development office unless cost and operation effective.

(Sec. 725) Obligates specified amounts of agricultural commodities to assist foreign countries mitigate the effects of HIV and AIDS.

(Sec. 726) Makes additional appropriations for Bill Emerson and Mickey Leland Hunger Fellowships.

(Sec. 727) Provides that any balances available to carry out Title III of the Agricultural Trade Development and Assistance Act of 1954, and any recoveries and reimbursements that become available, may be used to carry out Title II of such Act.

(Sec. 728) Amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to increase obligated funding for the national sheep industry improvement center revolving fund.

(Sec. 729) Makes Coachella, California, eligible for the rural community advancement program.

(Sec. 730) Considers Casa Grande, Arizona, as meeting the requirements of a rural area under the rural housing provisions of the Housing Act of 1949.

(Sec.731) Directs the Natural Resources Conservation Service to provide specified watershed and flood prevention assistance to the DuPage County, Illinois, Waynewood drainage improvement project.

(Sec. 732) Makes any current Rural Utilities Service borrower within 100 miles of New York City eligible for certain assistance related to the terrorist events of September 11, 2001.

(Sec. 733) Appropriates additional funds for livestock producers who suffered 2002 losses in counties that received emergency designation after January 1, 2002.

(Sec. 734) Prohibits funds made available under this Act from being transferred to any Federal Government entity unless authorized by an appropriations Act.

(Sec. 735) Limits FY 2003 funds for the export enhancement program.

(Sec. 738) Directs the Secretary to use specified funds to compensate Florida commercial citrus and lime growers for trees removed in citrus canker quarantine areas after September 30, 2001.

(Sec. 739) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act to pay the salaries and expenses of personnel to release information that may be used by terrorists to target biomedical or agricultural research personnel or facilities.

(Sec. 740) Makes Carolina, Puerto Rico, eligible for Rural Utilities Service grants and loans.

(Sec. 741) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act to establish a task force to review the Agricultural Research Service, as provided for by the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002.

(Sec. 743) Makes Starkville, Mississippi, eligible for rural community advancement program grants and loans.

(Sec. 744) Authorizes the Secretary to use specified food stamp funds for commodity processing, storage, transporting, and distribution.

(Sec. 745) Limits wetlands reserve program enrollment acreage for 2003.

(Sec. 746) Limits funds for the environmental quality incentives program.

(Sec. 747) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act to extend the conservation security program beyond Iowa.

(Sec. 748) Makes Hollister, Salinas, and Watsonville, California, eligible for Rural Housing Service programs.

(Sec. 749) Prohibits the use of funds under this Act to consolidate the FDA Office of Public Affairs and the Office of Legislation.

(Sec. 751) Makes Vicksburg, Mississippi, eligible for Rural Housing Service programs.

(Sec. 752) Rescinds certain FY 2003 funds for the experimental rural clean water program.

(Sec. 753) Prohibits funds from being obligated for payment on any new contract to a subsidiary of a publicly traded corporation if the corporation is incorporated in a tax haven country but the United States is the principal market for the public trading of the corporation's stock. Permits the president to waive such prohibition in the interest of national security.

Defines ``tax haven country'' as: (1) Barbados; (2) Bermuda; (3) British Virgin Islands; (4) Cayman Islands; (5) Commonwealth of the Bahamas; (6) Cyprus; (7) Gibraltar; (8) Isle of Man; (9) the Principality of Liechtenstein; (10) the Principality of Monaco; or (11) the Republic of the Seychelles.