Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/09/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/10/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/10/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/17/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/02/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/03/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/04/2002