Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/28/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/07/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/07/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/12/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/12/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/26/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/26/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/26/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/26/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/17/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/24/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/24/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/24/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/03/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/03/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/13/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/18/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/12/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/10/2002