Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/04/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/18/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/18/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/18/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/18/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/18/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/24/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/24/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/07/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/07/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/07/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/07/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/10/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/10/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/10/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/24/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/24/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/24/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/24/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/24/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/14/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/14/2002