Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/13/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/30/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/17/2002