Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/04/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/12/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/12/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/12/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/17/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/17/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/19/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/25/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/03/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/08/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/12/2002