Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/09/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/08/2002