Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/05/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/10/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/19/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/03/2002