Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/09/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/24/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2002