Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/09/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/09/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 10/09/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/10/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/10/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew