Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/04/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/09/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/09/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/11/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/11/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/11/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/11/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/17/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/19/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/24/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 10/01/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/07/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/13/2002