Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/10/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/11/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/24/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/01/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/01/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/01/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/02/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/02/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/02/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/02/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/03/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/03/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/03/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/03/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/03/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/07/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/08/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/08/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/08/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/16/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/16/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/16/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/16/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/16/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/16/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/16/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/16/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/13/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/13/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/13/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/13/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/13/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/13/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2002