Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/14/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/14/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/14/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/14/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/14/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/21/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/21/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/21/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/21/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/21/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/21/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/28/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/28/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/28/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/28/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/25/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/05/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/05/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/05/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/05/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/19/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/19/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 09/19/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/19/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/19/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/19/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/25/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/16/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/16/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/20/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/20/2002