Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/09/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/17/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/17/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/17/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/17/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/17/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/24/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/24/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/26/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/01/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/01/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/01/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/02/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/02/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/02/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/02/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/02/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/02/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/02/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/02/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/15/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/15/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/15/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/15/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/15/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/15/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/15/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/15/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/15/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/15/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/15/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/15/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/15/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/31/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/31/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/31/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/31/2002