Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/14/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/14/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/14/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/14/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/27/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/27/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/21/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/21/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/21/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/08/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/08/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/04/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/24/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/29/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/26/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/22/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/10/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/28/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/19/2002