Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/12/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/12/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/12/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 09/12/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/12/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/19/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/24/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/01/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/01/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/07/2002