Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/19/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/19/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/19/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/24/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/24/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/24/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/24/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/24/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/24/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/26/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/26/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/01/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/01/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/01/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/01/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/01/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/03/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/03/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/03/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/08/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/10/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/16/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/16/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/16/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/21/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/24/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/28/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/31/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/14/2002