There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Beneficiary Skilled Nursing Protection Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend for 3 additional years a temporary increase in payment for skilled nursing facility services under the Medicare Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/19/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
10/08/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/19/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/19/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/03/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/03/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/09/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/09/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/10/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/24/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/24/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/24/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/14/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/14/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/14/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/14/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/22/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/19/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/19/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/08/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5411.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/19/2002)

Medicare Beneficiary Skilled Nursing Protection Act of 2002 - Amends the Medicare, Medicaid, and SCHIP Benefits Improvement and Protection Act of 2000 to extend for three years the temporary increase in the nursing component of the Federal prospective payment rate.

Amends the Medicare, Medicaid, and SCHIP Balanced Budget Refinement Act of 1999 to extend for three years the increase in the skilled nursing facility adjusted Federal per diem rate under the Social Security Act.