Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/03/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/03/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/03/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/09/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/09/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/10/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/24/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/24/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/24/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/24/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/14/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/14/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/14/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/14/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/22/2002