Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 09/19/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/19/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/14/2002