Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/07/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/07/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/07/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/14/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/14/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2001