Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/24/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/24/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/24/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/25/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/26/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/01/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/24/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/24/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/12/2002