Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/08/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/08/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/26/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/07/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/26/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/24/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/03/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/03/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/03/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/03/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/23/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/23/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/23/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/23/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/23/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/18/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/18/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/18/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/18/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/18/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/18/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/18/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/18/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/18/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/18/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/10/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/07/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/08/2002