Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/24/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/12/2002