Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/26/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/26/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/01/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/03/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/07/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/09/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/15/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/15/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/15/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/15/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/15/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/15/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/15/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/15/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/16/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/21/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/28/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/31/2002