Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 09/30/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/01/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/02/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/03/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/09/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/16/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/12/2002