Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/03/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/03/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/09/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/15/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/15/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/12/2002