Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/07/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/07/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/07/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/07/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/07/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 10/07/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/07/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/07/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/07/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/07/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 10/07/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/09/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/09/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/09/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/09/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/09/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/09/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/09/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/09/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/10/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/10/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/10/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/10/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/10/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/10/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/10/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/10/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/15/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/15/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/15/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/15/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/15/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/15/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/15/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/15/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/15/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/15/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/16/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/16/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/16/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/16/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/16/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/16/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/16/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/19/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/19/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/19/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/19/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/19/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/19/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/19/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/19/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/19/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/19/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/19/2002