Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/12/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/12/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/26/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/03/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/25/2001