Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/18/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/19/2002