There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 504 West Hamilton Street in Allentown, Pennsylvania, as the "Edward N. Cahn Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-31. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001Presented to President.
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2001Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8994)
02/28/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 18).(text: CR H449)
02/12/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/20/2001Became Public Law No: 107-31. (TXT | PDF)
08/20/2001Signed by President.
08/10/2001HousePresented to President.
08/06/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2001SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8994)
03/01/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/28/2001-12:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/28/2001-12:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 18). (text: CR H449)
02/28/2001-12:09pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H460)
02/28/2001-10:40amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/28/2001-10:30amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 558.
02/28/2001-10:30amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H449-451)
02/28/2001-10:30amHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/13/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/12/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/12/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/12/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/13/2001 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works03/01/2001 Referred to
08/03/2001 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.558. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/28/2001)

Designates the Federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 504 West Hamilton Street in Allentown, Pennsylvania, as the Edward N. Cahn Federal Building and United States Courthouse.