Text: H.R.5587 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2002)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 107th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 5587 Introduced in House (IH)]







107th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 5587

   To extend the program under which temporary extended unemployment 
           compensation is provided, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            October 9, 2002

Mr. English (for himself, Mr. Weller, Ms. Hart, Mr. Herger, Ms. Dunn of 
   Washington, Mr. Shaw, Mr. Shuster, Mr. Pickering, Mr. Walden, Mr. 
   Ehrlich, and Mr. Foley) introduced the following bill; which was 
              referred to the Committee on Ways and Means

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
   To extend the program under which temporary extended unemployment 
           compensation is provided, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. TEMPORARY CONTINUATION OF TEUCA BENEFITS.

    (a) In General.--Title II of the Temporary Extended Unemployment 
Compensation Act of 2002 (Public Law 107-147; 116 Stat. 26) is amended 
by adding at the end the following:

``SEC. 210. EXTENSION OF PROGRAM IN HIGH UNEMPLOYMENT STATES.

    ``(a) In General.--Notwithstanding section 208(2), an agreement 
entered into under this title shall apply to weeks of unemployment 
beginning after December 28, 2002, and ending before April 1, 2003, but 
only as provided in this section and section 211.
    ``(b) New Account.--If, at any time during the period described in 
subsection (a), an individual's State is in an extended benefit period 
(as determined under section 203(c)(2)), and such individual meets the 
requirements of section 202(b)-(c), such State shall establish an 
account under this section for such individual (to be available 
beginning with the individual's first week of unemployment within such 
period as to which both of those conditions are met) in an amount equal 
to the amount determined in accordance with section 203(b).
    ``(c) Eligibility for Payments.--In the case of an individual for 
whom an account is established under subsection (b)--
            ``(1) temporary extended unemployment compensation shall be 
        payable for any week of unemployment described in subsection 
        (a) for which such individual would qualify if the criteria in 
        effect for the week ending on December 28, 2002, were applied 
        (and section 202(d)(3) were disregarded); and
            ``(2) any temporary extended unemployment compensation 
        payable to an individual under this section shall be payable 
        only out of the account established for such individual under 
        subsection (b).
    ``(d) Ineligible Individuals.--Notwithstanding any other provision 
of this section, no account under subsection (b) shall be established 
for the benefit of an individual for whom an account was established 
under section 203, if--
            ``(1) such account was at any time augmented in the manner 
        described in section 203(c); and
            ``(2) such account (as so augmented)--
                    ``(A) was exhausted before December 29, 2002; or
                    ``(B) remains available, for weeks beginning on or 
                after December 29, 2002, by virtue of section 211.

``SEC. 211. PHASE-OUT PROVISIONS.

    ``(a) In General.--In the case of an individual who is receiving 
temporary extended unemployment compensation for a week of unemployment 
ending on December 28, 2002, the provisions of this title and of any 
agreement then in effect shall be applied in a manner such that any 
amounts remaining in an account established for such individual under 
section 203 as of that date shall continue to remain available to the 
same extent and in the same manner as if section 208(2) had been 
amended by striking `January 1' and inserting `April 1'.
    ``(b) Coordination Provision.--After any amounts (in an account 
established under section 203) remaining available for the benefit of 
an individual by virtue of subsection (a) are exhausted, section 210 
shall apply to such individual in accordance with its terms.
    ``(c) Rule of Construction.--Nothing in this title shall be 
considered to permit or require the payment of any amount, out of an 
account established under section 203 or 210, for any week of 
unemployment ending after March 31, 2003.''.
    (b) Clerical Amendment.--The table of contents for such Act is 
amended by inserting after the item relating to section 209 the 
following:

``210. Extension of program in high unemployment States.
``211. Phase-out provisions.''.
                                 <all>