Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/10/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/10/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/10/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/10/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/15/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/15/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/15/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/16/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/12/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/12/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/14/2002