Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/03/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/06/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/06/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 01/30/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/26/2001