Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/13/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/08/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/20/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/08/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/23/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/13/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/28/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/28/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/28/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/12/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/14/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/10/2002