Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/13/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001